California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1679 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2023

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2023

Amended

Bill August 14, 2023
Bill June 19, 2023