|
09/12/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 216, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4988.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 20).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/20/2024
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/12/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/11/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 17.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|