California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1853 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 12, 2024

Amended

Bill June 3, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024