Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2024
|
In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 24). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2024
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 5508.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2024
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2024
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2024
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
(Pending re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2024
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4775.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2024
|
Introduced measure version corrected.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2024
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2024
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|