California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB3238 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2024

Amended

Bill July 8, 2024
Bill June 12, 2024
Bill May 16, 2024
Bill April 25, 2024
Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 8, 2024