Assembly
|
09/20/2024
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2024
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2024
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2023
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2023
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2023
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1705.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2023
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2023
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2023
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2023
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2023
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2023
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/16/2023
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/06/2022
|
From printer. May be heard in committee January 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
12/05/2022
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|