California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB52 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Amended

Bill August 15, 2024
Bill June 15, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023
Bill March 16, 2023