|
09/27/2024
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 791, Statutes of 2024.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2024
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2024
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2024
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5655.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2024
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6510.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Read third time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2024
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2024
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2024
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.M. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2024
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2024
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2024
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4056.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 3722.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3535.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2024
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|