California 2023-2024 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1271 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2024

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2024

Amended

Bill August 22, 2024
Bill June 26, 2024
Bill June 11, 2024
Bill April 24, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024
Bill March 20, 2024