Senate | 02/01/2024 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | May 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Set for hearing May 18. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2023 | Set for hearing May 15. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2023 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 936.) (April 26). | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Set for hearing April 26. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 657.) (April 11). | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Set for hearing April 11. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E.Q. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Senate | 12/06/2022 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5. | ||
Senate | 12/05/2022 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |