03/17/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
03/11/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 03/11/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/11/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/08/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/03/2022 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |