Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB014 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 18, 2022
Fiscal Note January 13, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 14, 2022
Bill February 11, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2022

Amended

Bill March 9, 2022
Bill March 8, 2022