Colorado 2022 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB014 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/08/2022

                    Second Regular Session
Seventy-third General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REVISED
This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted
on Second Reading in the Second House
LLS NO. 22-0119.01 Conrad Imel x2313
SENATE BILL 22-014
Senate Committees House Committees
State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Education
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING THE ADMIN ISTRATION OF THE 	COLORADO YOUTH101
ADVISORY COUNCIL.102
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov/
.)
Colorado Youth Advisory Council Review Committee. The
Colorado youth advisory council (council) is comprised of legislative
members and nonlegislative members who are 14 to 19 years old. Under
existing law, nonlegislative members are appointed to the council by a
majority vote of its members. The bill changes the deadline to appoint
nonlegislative members and removes the requirement that nonlegislative
HOUSE
2nd Reading Unamended
March 8, 2022
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
February 14, 2022
SENATE
2nd Reading Unamended
February 11, 2022
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Moreno, Fenberg, Priola, Bridges, Coleman, Coram, Donovan, Fields, Garcia, Ginal,
Gonzales, Hansen, Kolker, Lee, Pettersen, Rankin, Rodriguez, Simpson, Story, Winter,
Woodward, Zenzinger
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
McKean and McLachlan, 
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute.
Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. members be selected by a majority vote of the council.
Existing law requires the council to elect 2 co-chairs and 2
vice-chairs and permits the council to further develop a leadership
structure for the council. The bill repeals the requirement to appoint
co-chairs and vice-chairs, requires the council to adopt written bylaws
setting forth a leadership structure for the council, and clarifies that the
council can elect members to serve in any leadership position described
in its bylaws.
The council is required to meet 4 times per year. The bill requires
that 2 meetings be held in person.
The bill changes the council's annual reporting requirement so that
the council reports to the Colorado youth advisory council review
committee (review committee) during the interim.
The bill requires the chair of the review committee and the chair
of the legislative council to sign council contracts and requires the
president of the senate and the speaker of the house of representatives to
appoint the chair and vice-chair of the review committee on an annually
alternating basis.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-2-1303, amend2
(2)(a)(III)(A) and (4); and add (4.5) as follows:3
2-2-1303.  Membership - selection - terms.4
(2) (a)  Nonlegislative council members shall be appointed as follows:5
(III) (A)  On or before May 31, 2014, and on or before May 31
6
each year thereafter, AUGUST 31 OF EACH YEAR, the council members7
shall approve subsequent appointments to the council. by a majority vote.8
A youth who meets the criteria set forth in subsection (1) of this section9
may apply to the council to be considered for participation in the council.10
(4)  The council shall elect two co-chairs and two vice-chairs at its11
first meeting and annually thereafter. One of the co-chairs and one of the12
vice-chairs shall be legislative members, to be elected at the first council13
meeting after December 15. The other co-chair and the other vice-chair14
shall be nonlegislative members, to be elected at the first meeting15
014-2- following the annual May 31 appointment of new nonlegislative1
members. The co-chairs and vice-chairs shall serve for terms of one year.2
A vacancy on the council shall be filled through a vote of the members3
for the remainder of the unexpired term. Vacancies of nonlegislative4
members on the council shall be filled pursuant to the application process5
described in subparagraph (III) of paragraph (a) of subsection (2)6
SUBSECTION (2)(a)(III) of this section for biennial appointments.7
Vacancies of legislative members shall be filled by the appointing8
authority. Vacancies of nonlegislative members on the council who are9
not designated as at-large members shall be filled by a youth coming from10
the same senate district as the departing nonlegislative member.11
(4.5)  T
HE COUNCIL SHALL ADOPT WRITTEN BYLAWS SETTING12
FORTH A LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE FOR THE COUNCIL . THE COUNCIL MAY13
AMEND ITS BYLAWS AS IT DETERMINES IT IS NECESSARY . THE COUNCIL14
MAY APPOINT MEMBERS TO SERVE IN ANY LEADERSHIP ROLES DESCRIBED15
IN ITS BYLAWS.16
SECTION 2. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-2-1304, amend17
(2)(b), (2)(d), and (5) as follows:18
2-2-1304.  Duties - meetings - community outreach -19
designation of organization to accept donations - authority to20
contract. (2) (b)  The council shall meet at least four times each year,21
with two meetings occurring during the regular legislative session and22
two meetings occurring after the regular legislative session has23
concluded. C
OUNCIL MEMBERS MAY ATTEND AND PARTICIPATE IN24
COUNCIL MEETINGS REMOTELY , BUT AT LEAST TWO OF THE COUNCIL 'S25
MEETINGS EACH YEAR MUST BE HELD IN PERSON , WITH ALL ATTENDING26
MEMBERS AT THE SAME PHYSICAL LOCATION . Additional meetings may be27
014
-3- held at the discretion of the co-chairs of the council LEADERSHIP, subject1
to available moneys MONEY.2
(d)  The council shall have HAS the authority to develop rules AND3
procedures and a leadership structure for the council TO GOVERN ITS4
ACTIVITIES.5
(5)  The council is authorized to contract with the designated6
organization or other nonprofit or private entities for the implementation7
of this part 13. Any contract entered into by the council shall MUST be8
signed by the legislative co-chair of the council CHAIR OF THE REVIEW9
COMMITTEE AND THE CHAIR OF THE LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL .10
SECTION 3. In Colorado Revised Statutes, amend 2-2-1305 as11
follows:12
2-2-1305.  Reporting requirements. On or before April 30, 2014,13
and on or before April 30 each year thereafter, the council shall make14
joint reports to legislative committees of the senate and the house of15
representatives as appropriate. THE COUNCIL SHALL REPORT TO THE16
REVIEW COMMITTEE DURING EACH INTERIM THAT THE REVIEW COMMITTEE17
MEETS. The reports shall REPORT MUST include, at a minimum, a summary18
of the council's recommendations concerning key issues for youth, for the19
current legislative session. INCLUDING ANY PROPOSALS FOR LEGISLATION20
THE COUNCIL WOULD LIKE THE REVIEW COMMITTEE TO CONSIDER , and a21
summary of the council's work during the previous legislative session and22
interim PRIOR YEAR.23
SECTION 4. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 2-2-1305.5, amend24
(4) as follows:25
2-2-1305.5.  Colorado youth advisory council review committee26
- created. (4)  The chair of the review committee is the legislative27
014
-4- member who is serving as a co-chair of the council pursuant to section1
2-2-1303 (4). The vice-chair of the review committee is the legislative2
member who is serving as a vice-chair of the council pursuant to section3
2-2-1303 (4). IN ODD-NUMBERED YEARS, THE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF4
REPRESENTATIVES SHALL APPOINT THE CHAIR OF THE REVIEW COMMITTEE5
AND THE PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE SHALL APPOINT THE VICE -CHAIR. IN6
EVEN-NUMBERED YEARS, THE PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE SHALL APPOINT7
THE CHAIR AND THE SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES SHALL8
APPOINT THE VICE-CHAIR. THE APPOINTING AUTHORITIES SHALL MAKE THE9
APPOINTMENTS ON OR BEFORE APRIL 30 OF EACH YEAR.10
SECTION 5. Safety clause. The general assembly hereby finds,11
determines, and declares that this act is necessary for the immediate12
preservation of the public peace, health, or safety.13
014
-5-