Senate | 05/11/2022 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Adhere | ||
House | 05/11/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/10/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
House | 05/06/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/17/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |