Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB023 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 25, 2022
Fiscal Note May 11, 2022
Fiscal Note March 10, 2022
Fiscal Note January 26, 2022
Bill January 12, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 17, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022

Amended

Bill May 11, 2022
Bill May 10, 2022