Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB023 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 Second Regular Session
22 Seventy-third General Assembly
33 STATE OF COLORADO
4-REREVISED
5-This Version Includes All Amendments
6-Adopted in the Second House
4+REVISED
5+This Version Includes All Amendments Adopted
6+on Second Reading in the Second House
77 LLS NO. 22-0408.01 Jane Ritter x4342
88 SENATE BILL 22-023
99 Senate Committees House Committees
1010 Judiciary Judiciary
1111 Appropriations
1212 A BILL FOR AN ACT
1313 C
1414 ONCERNING PROHIBITING DECEPT IVE TACTICS DURING CUSTODIAL
1515 101
1616 INTERROGATION OF A JUVENILE .102
1717 Bill Summary
1818 (Note: This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
1919 not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
2020 passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
2121 applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
2222 http://leg.colorado.gov
2323 .)
2424 The bill prohibits a law enforcement officer or an agent who
2525 assists, cooperates with, or otherwise facilitates a custodial interrogation
2626 with a juvenile (law enforcement official) from using deception and false
2727 facts or beliefs (deception) to obtain a statement or admission from the
2828 juvenile. Any statement or admission obtained during the course of a
2929 juvenile custodial interrogation in which a law enforcement official
3030 HOUSE
31-3rd Reading Unamended
32-May 11, 2022
33-HOUSE
3431 Amended 2nd Reading
3532 May 10, 2022
3633 SENATE
3734 3rd Reading Unamended
3835 February 17, 2022
3936 SENATE
4037 Amended 2nd Reading
4138 February 15, 2022
4239 SENATE SPONSORSHIP
4340 Gonzales, Buckner, Coleman, Lee, Moreno, Rodriguez, Story
4441 HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
45-Bacon and Gonzales-Gutierrez, Benavidez, Bernett, Caraveo, Cutter, Esgar, Froelich,
46-Herod, Hooton, Kipp, Lindsay, Michaelson Jenet, Sirota, Woodrow
42+Bacon and Gonzales-Gutierrez,
4743 Shading denotes HOUSE amendment. Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
4844 Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing statute.
4945 Dashes through the words indicate deletions from existing statute. knowingly uses deception is presumptively inadmissible against the
5046 juvenile in an evidentiary hearing unless the prosecution proves by clear
5147 and convincing evidence that the statement or admission was made
5248 voluntarily.
5349 The bill requires law enforcement officials to electronically record
5450 all juvenile custodial interrogations.
5551 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
5652 SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 19-2.5-203, add (8)2
5753 as follows:3
5854 19-2.5-203. Statements - definitions. (8) ON OR BEFORE4
5955 FEBRUARY 28, 2023, ANY COLORADO LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY THAT5
6056 EMPLOYS A PEACE OFFICER REQUIRED TO BE P.O.S.T.-CERTIFIED6
6157 PURSUANT TO SECTION 16-2.5-102 THAT IS CHARGED WITH ENFORCING THE7
6258 CRIMINAL LAWS OF COLORADO, AND THAT, AS PART OF ANY CRIMINAL8
6359 INVESTIGATION, USES OR MIGHT USE ANY JUVENILE CUSTODIAL9
6460 INTERROGATION PROCEDURE, SHALL ADOPT WRITTEN POLICIES AND10
6561 PROCEDURES CONCERNING THE CUSTODIAL INTERROGATION OF A JUVENILE11
6662 CONDUCTED BY THAT LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY. THE POLICIES AND12
6763 PROCEDURES ADOPTED AND IMPLEMENTED BY A LAW ENFORCEMENT13
6864 AGENCY MUST BE CONSISTENT WITH JUVENILE CUSTODIAL INTERROGATION14
6965 PROCEDURES OF THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHIEFS OF POLICE15
7066 OR OTHER NATIONALLY RECOGNIZED PEER-REVIEWED RESEARCH. THE16
7167 POLICIES AND PROCEDURES MUST INCLUDE REQUIREMENTS FOR :17
7268 (a) AGE-APPROPRIATE MIRANDA WARNINGS THAT SHALL BE18
7369 ADMINISTERED PRIOR TO A CUSTODIAL INTERROGATION OF A JUVENILE ;19
7470 (b) ELECTRONIC RECORDING BY LAW ENFORCEMENT OF ALL20
7571 JUVENILE CUSTODIAL INTERROGATIONS PURSUANT TO SECTION 16-3-60121
7672 WITHOUT REGARD TO THE NATURE OF THE OFFENSE ; AND22
7773 023-2- (c) LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICIALS TO TAILOR THE QUESTIONS FOR1
7874 A CUSTODIAL INTERROGATION OF A JUVENILE TO THE JUVENILE'S AGE,2
7975 SOPHISTICATION, MATURITY, LEVEL OF EDUCATION, MENTAL ABILITY, AND3
8076 OTHER PERTINENT INFORMATION .4
8177 5
8278 SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act6
8379 takes effect February 28, 2023; except that, if a referendum petition is7
8480 filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V of the state constitution against8
8581 this act or an item, section, or part of this act within the ninety-day period9
8682 after final adjournment of the general assembly, then the act, item,10
8783 section, or part will not take effect unless approved by the people at the11
8884 general election to be held in November 2022 and, in such case, will take12
8985 effect February 28, 2023.13
9086 023
9187 -3-