|
05/23/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Water Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Water
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
|
|
|