LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB028
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB028
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2022 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB028
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
January 17, 2022
Bill
January 12, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 17, 2022
Compare
Bill
February 15, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 12, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 29, 2022
Compare
Bill
April 27, 2022
Compare