|
06/02/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/09/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2022
|
House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass
|
|
|
|
04/21/2022
|
First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2022
|
House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/06/2022 - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
House Third Reading Re-referred to House Committee of the Whole - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2022
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2022
|
House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/25/2022 - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 03/21/2022 - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology
|
|
|