LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB034
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB034
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2022 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB034
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 27, 2022
Bill
January 12, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 17, 2022
Compare
Bill
February 16, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 28, 2022
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 8, 2022
Compare
Bill
April 7, 2022
Compare
Bill
March 25, 2022
Compare