05/24/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
House | 05/17/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
05/17/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/17/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/10/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/06/2022 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
House | 05/03/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 05/03/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 05/02/2022 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
Senate | 04/29/2022 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |