Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB070 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 8, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 3, 2022
Bill May 2, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill May 10, 2022
Bill May 6, 2022