04/07/2022 | Governor Signed | |||
03/28/2022 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 03/25/2022 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 03/25/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/18/2022 | Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass | ||
House | 03/16/2022 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2022 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/09/2022 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/23/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |