Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB115 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 8, 2022
Fiscal Note February 16, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 25, 2022

Amended

Bill March 16, 2022
Bill March 15, 2022