|
06/08/2022
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/18/2022
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2022
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2022
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2022
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|