Colorado 2022 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 29, 2022
Fiscal Note March 17, 2022
Fiscal Note February 27, 2022
Bill February 14, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 6, 2022
Bill April 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2022

Amended

Bill May 11, 2022
Bill May 10, 2022