Senate | 04/21/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/20/2022 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/12/2022 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over to 04/22/2022 - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/11/2022 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to |