06/05/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/15/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |