Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1024 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note August 7, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note February 6, 2023
Bill January 9, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 12, 2023

Amended

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023