Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1141 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 26, 2023
Fiscal Note February 3, 2023
Bill January 31, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 15, 2023

Amended

Bill March 10, 2023