House | 05/11/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Lay Over Unamended - Amendment(s) Failed | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/16/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | ||
Senate | 01/10/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |