Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB027 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 04/12/2023

                            First Regular Session
Seventy-fourth General Assembly
STATE OF COLORADO
REENGROSSED
This Version Includes All Amendments
Adopted in the House of Introduction
LLS NO. 23-0495.01 Chelsea Princell x4335
SENATE BILL 23-027
Senate Committees House Committees
Health & Human Services
Appropriations
A BILL FOR AN ACT
C
ONCERNING FUNDING OF THE FOOD PANTRY ASSIST ANCE GRANT101
PROGRAM.102
Bill Summary
(Note:  This summary applies to this bill as introduced and does
not reflect any amendments that may be subsequently adopted. If this bill
passes third reading in the house of introduction, a bill summary that
applies to the reengrossed version of this bill will be available at
http://leg.colorado.gov
.)
For the 2023-24 state fiscal year through the 2026-27 state fiscal
year, the bill appropriates $3 million annually from the general fund to the
food pantry assistance grant program.
The bill repeals the food pantry assistance grant program, effective
July 1, 2028.
SENATE
3rd Reading Unamended
April 12, 2023
SENATE
Amended 2nd Reading
April 11, 2023
SENATE SPONSORSHIP
Cutter, Bridges, Buckner, Coleman, Danielson, Exum, Fenberg, Ginal, Gonzales, Hansen,
Hinrichsen, Jaquez Lewis, Kolker, Marchman, Moreno, Mullica, Priola, Roberts, Rodriguez,
Sullivan, Winter F., Zenzinger
HOUSE SPONSORSHIP
Story, 
Shading denotes HOUSE amendment.  Double underlining denotes SENATE amendment.
Capital letters or bold & italic numbers indicate new material to be added to existing law.
Dashes through the words or numbers indicate deletions from existing law. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Colorado:1
SECTION 1. In Colorado Revised Statutes, 26-2-139, add (7)2
and (8) as follows:3
26-2-139.  Food pantry assistance grant program - created -4
timeline and criteria - grants - definitions - repeal.     (7)  FOR STATE5
FISCAL YEARS 2023-24 THROUGH 2026-27, SUBJECT TO AVAILABLE6
APPROPRIATIONS, THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY SHALL APPROPRIATE MONEY7
FROM THE GENERAL FUND TO THE STATE DEPARTMENT FOR THE GRANT8
PROGRAM.9
(8)  T
HIS SECTION IS REPEALED, EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2028.10
SECTION 2. Act subject to petition - effective date. This act11
takes effect at 12:01 a.m. on the day following the expiration of the12
ninety-day period after final adjournment of the general assembly; except13
that, if a referendum petition is filed pursuant to section 1 (3) of article V14
of the state constitution against this act or an item, section, or part of this15
act within such period, then the act, item, section, or part will not take16
effect unless approved by the people at the general election to be held in17
November 2024 and, in such case, will take effect on the date of the18
official declaration of the vote thereon by the governor.19
027-2-