LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Colorado CO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB027
Draft Versions
CO
Colorado Senate Bill SB027
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Colorado 2023 Regular Session
Colorado Senate Bill SB027
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note
January 19, 2023
Bill
January 10, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 12, 2023
Compare
Bill
April 11, 2023
Compare