|
05/15/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/05/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
|
|
|