Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB039 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 5, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 6, 2023
Fiscal Note February 9, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 24, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023