|
06/02/2023
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/05/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate Considered House Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
|
|
|