Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB049 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 7, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023
Fiscal Note March 10, 2023
Fiscal Note January 27, 2023
Bill January 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2023
Bill March 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023