05/15/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/05/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/05/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Senate Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |