Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB087 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 22, 2023
Fiscal Note February 3, 2023
Bill January 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 15, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2023

Amended

Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 19, 2023