05/12/2023 | Governor Signed | |||
05/05/2023 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/05/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | ||
Senate | 03/02/2023 | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |