Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB161 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note February 23, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill April 6, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 24, 2023
Bill April 22, 2023