Colorado 2023 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB267 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 05/03/2023

                    Page 1 
May 3, 2023  SB 23-267  
 
 
 Legislative Council Staff 
Nonpartisan Services for Colorado’s Legislature 
 
Revised Fiscal Note  
(replaces fiscal note dated April 10, 2023)  
 
Drafting Number: 
Prime Sponsors: 
LLS 23-0994  
Sen. Van Winkle; Cutter 
Rep. Titone; Bradley  
Date: 
Bill Status: 
Fiscal Analyst: 
May 3, 2023 
House Appropriations 
Matt Bishop | 303-866-4796 
matt.bishop@coleg.gov  
Bill Topic: CHATFIELD STATE PARK WATER QUALITY FEE  
Summary of  
Fiscal Impact: 
☒ State Revenue 
☒ State Expenditure 
☐ State Transfer 
☐ TABOR Refund 
☒ Local Government 
☐ Statutory Public Entity 
 
The bill creates a process to establish a fee to support water quality efforts by the 
Chatfield Watershed Authority.  It increases state workload in FY 2023-24 and may 
increase state and local revenue and expenditures beginning in FY 2024-25. 
Appropriation 
Summary: 
No appropriation is required. 
Fiscal Note 
Status: 
The revised fiscal note reflects the reengrossed bill, as amended by the House 
Finance Committee. 
 
 
Table 1 
State Fiscal Impacts Under SB 23-267 
 
  
Budget Year 
FY 2023-24 
Out Year 
FY 2024-25 
Out Year 
FY 2025-26 
Revenue
1
 	Cash Funds 	-       $27,500       $55,000 
Expenditures 	Cash Funds 	-       $27,500 $55,000 
Transfers  	-       -       -       
Other Budget Impacts 
 
-       -       -       
1
 Revenue is based on the maximum fee amount, if the fee is enacted. 
 
 
    Page 2 
May 3, 2023  SB 23-267  
 
 
Summary of Legislation 
The bill creates a process for establishing a water quality fee for Chatfield State Park.  The Department 
of Natural Resources (DNR) must adopt rules regarding criteria under which park visitors may be 
charged a fee by July 1, 2024.  The fee is limited to $2.00 and may not be charged to a visitor holding 
an annual or lifetime pass. At earliest, the fee takes effect January 1, 2025, and any fee revenue 
collected is transmitted to the Chatfield Watershed Authority, less an amount retained by DNR to 
cover its administrative expenses.  The authority must spend at least 25 percent of the revenue on 
water quality projects in Chatfield State Park.  DNR must review the fee in FY 2029-30 and may adjust 
the fee amount or eliminate the fee. 
Background and Assumptions 
The Chatfield Watershed Authority includes Jefferson county, Douglas county, the town of Castle 
Rock, the city of Littleton, the town of Larkspur, and water and wastewater providers monitor and 
protect water quality in the Chatfield reservoir and watershed.  In FY 2021-22, Chatfield State Park 
received an estimated 1.82 million visitors.  Park entry is $10 per vehicle for a day pass.  Attendance 
estimates are based on park entry data collected by DNR and uptake of the Keep Colorado Wild pass. 
For illustrative purposes, the fiscal note assumes that DNR will implement the fee at the maximum 
$2.00 per visit beginning January 1, 2025. 
State Revenue 
The bill increases revenue to the Parks and Recreation Cash Fund in the DNR from the water quality 
fee by an estimated $55,000 per year beginning in FY 2024-25, with half-year impacts in the first year, 
if the fee is enacted, based on the assumptions above. Because Colorado Parks and Wildlife has 
enterprise status, this revenue is not subject to TABOR. 
 
Fee impact on park visitors. Colorado law requires legislative service agency review of measures 
which create or increase any fee collected by a state agency.  The table below identifies the fee impact 
of this bill based on the fee levels in the bill and the assumptions above.  
 
Table 2 
Fee Impact on Visitors to Chatfield State Park 
 
Fiscal Year 
Type of 
Fee 
Proposed 
Fee 
Number 
Affected 
Total Fee 
Impact 
FY 2024-25 Water Quality $2.00 13,750 $27,500 
FY 2025-26 Water Quality $2.00 27,500 $55,000 
 
   Page 3 
May 3, 2023  SB 23-267  
 
 
State Expenditures 
The bill increases workload in DNR to conduct rulemaking in FY 2023-24, with support from the 
Department of Law.  This can be accomplished within existing appropriations.  
 
If DNR establishes the water quality fee, the bill increases state expenditures in DNR by the same 
amount as the revenue generated, paid from the Parks and Outdoor Recreation Cash Fund.  Less 
administrative expenses, fees collected are passed through DNR to the Chatfield Watershed 
Authority.  Expenditures are shown in Table 3. 
 
Table 3 
Expenditures Under SB 23-267 
 
 	FY 2023-24 FY 2024-25 FY 2025-26 
Department of Natural Resources            
Payment to Chatfield Watershed Authority 	-       $26,593       $53,185 
Administrative Costs 	-       $907 $1,815 
Total Cost 	-       $27,500 $55,000 
Local Government 
The Chatfield Watershed Authority is an intergovernmental agency whose members are counties, 
municipalities, and certain municipal districts and authorities in the watershed.  The bill increases 
revenue and expenditures in the Chatfield Watershed Authority by the amounts of the payments 
shown in Table 3. 
Effective Date 
The bill takes effect 90 days following adjournment of the General Assembly sine die, assuming no 
referendum petition is filed. 
State and Local Government Contacts 
Law  Natural Resources 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
The revenue and expenditure impacts in this fiscal note represent changes from current law under the bill for each 
fiscal year.  For additional information about fiscal notes, please visit:  leg.colorado.gov/fiscalnotes.