Colorado 2023 Regular Session

Colorado Senate Bill SB267 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note April 10, 2023
Bill April 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill May 8, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023