|
05/24/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/15/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs
|
|
|