Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1147 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 21, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2024
Bill March 8, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 14, 2024

Amended

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill April 23, 2024