Senate | 05/06/2024 | Senate Committee on Finance Postpone Indefinitely | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |