Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1148 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 4, 2024
Fiscal Note February 16, 2024
Bill January 29, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill March 26, 2024