|
05/13/2024
|
Governor Signed
|
|
|
|
05/09/2024
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2024
|
Senate Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over to 05/04/2024 - No Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2024
|
House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2024
|
House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Finance
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government
|
|
|