Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1313 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note July 31, 2024
Fiscal Note May 1, 2024
Fiscal Note April 10, 2024
Fiscal Note March 4, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill April 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 9, 2024

Amended

Bill May 7, 2024
Bill May 5, 2024