Colorado 2024 Regular Session

Colorado House Bill HB1336 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 24, 2024
Fiscal Note April 22, 2024
Fiscal Note March 8, 2024
Bill February 23, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2024

Amended

Bill May 1, 2024
Bill April 30, 2024